LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2351
Action History
MO
Missouri House Bill HB2351
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2024 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB2351
Action History
House
04/17/2024
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
House
04/17/2024
Executive Session Completed (H)
House
02/14/2024
Public Hearing Completed (H)
House
02/08/2024
Referred: Utilities(H)
House
01/10/2024
Read Second Time (H)
House
01/09/2024
Introduced and Read First Time (H)