House | 05/02/2024 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2 | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H) | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |