House | 05/09/2024 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 20 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Property Tax Reform(H) | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |