House | 05/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred: General Laws(H) | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |