House | 04/09/2024 | Reported Do Not Pass (H) - AYES: 3 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Referred: Transportation Accountability(H) | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |