House | 05/06/2024 | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Referred: Rural Community Development(H) | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |