Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - AMENDED - Monday, May 6, 2024, 12:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 25 PRESENT: 21
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 18 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|