House | 02/22/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Innovation and Technology(H) | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |