Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 25, 2024, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 22, 2024, 3:00 p.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Second read and referred: Health and Welfare(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred: Healthcare Reform(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|