House | 05/16/2024 | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 21 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |