House
|
04/30/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 30, 2024, 9:15 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Second read and referred: Economic Development and Tax Policy(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Read First Time (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Delivered to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 96 NOES: 31 PRESENT: 18
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred: Ways and Means(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|