Senate | 04/25/2024 | Second read and referred: Progress and Development(S) | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 24 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |