House | 03/13/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Re-referred to Committee: Economic Development(H) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H) | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |