House
|
04/29/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 29, 2024, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Read First Time (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Delivered to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 24
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred: Local Government(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|