House | 04/24/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |