House | 04/09/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |