Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - CANCELLED - Wednesday, May 1, 2024, 8:30 a.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Second read and referred: General Laws(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 132 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 12
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|