House | 05/06/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |