House
|
04/30/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 22, 2024, 2:45 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Second read and referred: Economic Development and Tax Policy(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Read First Time (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Delivered to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 19 PRESENT: 23
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
HCS#2 Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
HCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
HCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Returned to Committee of Origin (H) - Special Committee on Property Tax Reform AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Voted to Return to the Committee of Origin (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 19 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Referred: Special Committee on Property Tax Reform(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|