House | 04/15/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Homeland Security(H) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Offered (H) |