Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, April 29, 2024, 3:00 p.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 25, 2024, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|