House
|
07/11/2024
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Bill Placed on H Informal Calendar SBs for Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Hearing Conducted H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
SS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
SA 4 to SS S withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Motion to reconsider SA 4 to SS (Coleman) - Motion adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
SA 4 to SS S offered & adopted (Coleman)--(4268S03.16S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
SA 3 to SS S offered & Ruled out of order (Schroer)--(4268S03.05S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
SA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(4268S03.12S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
SA 1 to SS S withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Point of order (McCreery) - SA 1 to SS goes beyond scope of the bill - taken under advisement
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
SA 1 to SS S offered (Hoskins)--(4268S03.02S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
SS S offered (Black)--(4268S.03F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Reported from S Health and Welfare Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Voted Do Pass S Health and Welfare Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Hearing Conducted S Health and Welfare Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Second Read and Referred S Health and Welfare Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2023
|
Prefiled
|
|
|