Senate | 05/17/2024 | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | SA 1 to SS S offered (Roberts)--(3184S03.20S) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | SS S offered (Cierpiot)--(3184S.03F) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | S First Read | ||
Senate | 12/01/2023 | Prefiled |