Senate | 05/17/2024 | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | SS S offered (Arthur)--(4064S.04F) | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Reported from S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | S First Read | ||
Senate | 12/01/2023 | Prefiled |