House
|
05/17/2024
|
H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Bill Placed on H Informal Calendar SBs for Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Hearing Conducted H Insurance Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred H Insurance Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Updated Fiscal Note removes requirement for Fiscal Oversight Review - Bill returned from committee on Fiscal Oversight
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Crawford)--(3270S.05F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (3270S.03C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Hearing Cancelled S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2023
|
Prefiled
|
|
|