Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions for Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Hearing Cancelled H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
H Fist Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
SCS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(5118S03.02S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (w/ SCS/SCRs 24 & 25) Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee (5118S.03C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
S Offered
|
|
|