LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR48
Action History
MO
Missouri Senate Bill SJR48
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2024 Regular Session
Missouri Senate Bill SJR48
Action History
Senate
01/30/2024
Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 74, 48, 59, 61 & 83) Local Government and Elections Committee
Senate
01/29/2024
Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
Senate
01/25/2024
Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
Senate
01/03/2024
S First Read
Senate
12/01/2023
Prefiled