Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 24, 2025, 8:00 AM, Senate Conference Room 2 - 1st floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Second read and referred: General Laws(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Read First Time (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Reported to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Third Read and Passed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Action Postponed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Executive Session Continued
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred: Commerce(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2025
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2025
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|