House | 03/05/2025 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Referred: Children and Families(H) | ||
House | 01/09/2025 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/08/2025 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/04/2024 | Prefiled (H) |