House | 04/16/2025 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Referred: Rules - Administrative(H) | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Referred: Health and Mental Health(H) | ||
House | 01/09/2025 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/08/2025 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/05/2024 | Prefiled (H) |