House | 04/09/2025 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Referred: Rules - Legislative(H) | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Referred: Ways and Means(H) | ||
House | 01/09/2025 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/08/2025 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/05/2024 | Prefiled (H) |