House | 02/20/2025 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Referred: Pensions(H) | ||
House | 01/09/2025 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/08/2025 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/06/2024 | Prefiled (H) |