Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 1, 2025, May 1, 2025, 9:35 a.m., Senate Lounge - 3rd Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 7, 2025, 3:00 p.m., SCR 1 - 1st Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Third Read and Passed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2025
|
Referred: Government Efficiency(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2025
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2025
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|