Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 16, 2025, 8:00 a.m., SCR 1 - 1st Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Second read and referred: Families, Seniors and Health(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Read First Time (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Reported to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Third Read and Passed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2025
|
Action Postponed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2025
|
Executive Session Continued
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Referred: Health and Mental Health(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2025
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2025
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|