House | 04/23/2025 | Referred: Rules - Legislative(H) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Referred: Special Committee on Tax Reform(H) | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |