House | 04/15/2025 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Laid Over (H) - HA 2, pending and HA 1 adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Referred: Rules - Administrative(H) | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Referred: Elections(H) | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/16/2025 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |