Missouri 2025 Regular Session

Missouri Senate Bill SB146 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 EXPLANATION- Matter enclosed in bold-faced brackets [thus] in this bill is not enacted
33 and is intended to be omitted in the law.
44
55 FIRST REGULAR SESSION
66 SENATE BILL NO. 146
77 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY
88
99 INTRODUCED BY SENATOR COLEMAN.
1010 0647S.01I KRISTINA MARTIN, Secretary
1111 AN ACT
1212 To repeal section 143.011, RSMo, and to enact in lieu thereof one new section relating to income
1313 taxes.
1414
1515
1616 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Missouri, as follows:
1717 Section A. Section 143.011, RSMo, is repealed and one new 1
1818 section enacted in lieu thereof, to be known as section 143.011, 2
1919 to read as follows:3
2020 143.011. 1. For all tax years beginning on or before 1
2121 December 31, 2025, a tax is hereby imposed for every taxable 2
2222 year on the Missouri taxable income of every resident. The 3
2323 tax shall be determined by applying the tax table or the 4
2424 rate provided in section 143.021, which is based upon the 5
2525 following rates: 6
2626 7
2727 8
2828 If the Missouri taxable
2929 income is:
3030 The tax is:
3131 9
3232 10
3333 Not over $1,000.00 1 1/2% of the Missouri taxable
3434 income
3535
3636 11
3737 12
3838 Over $1,000 but not over
3939 $2,000
4040 $15 plus 2% of excess over
4141 $1,000
4242
4343 13
4444 14
4545 Over $2,000 but not over
4646 $3,000
4747 $35 plus 2 1/2% of excess over
4848 $2,000
4949
5050 15
5151 16
5252 Over $3,000 but not over
5353 $4,000
5454 $60 plus 3% of excess over
5555 $3,000
5656 SB 146 2
5757 2. (1) Notwithstanding the provisions of subsection 1 29
5858 of this section to the contrary, beginning with the 2023 30
5959 calendar year, the top rate of tax pursuant to subsection 1 31
6060 of this section shall be four and ninety-five hundredths 32
6161 percent. 33
6262 (2) The modification of tax rates made pursuant to 34
6363 this subsection shall apply only to tax years that begin on 35
6464 or after January 1, 2023. 36
6565 (3) The director of the department of revenue shall, 37
6666 by rule, adjust the tax table provided in subsection 1 of 38
6767 this section to effectuate the provisions of this 39
6868 subsection. The top remaining rate of tax shall apply to 40
6969 all income in excess of seven thousand dollars, as adjusted 41
7070 pursuant to subsection 5 of this section. 42
7171 3. (1) In addition to the rate reduction under 43
7272 subsection 2 of this section, beginning with the 2024 44
7373 calendar year, the top rate of tax under subsection 1 of 45
7474 this section may be reduced by fifteen hundredths of a 46
7575 17
7676 18
7777 Over $4,000 but not over
7878 $5,000
7979 $90 plus 3 1/2% of excess over
8080 $4,000
8181
8282 19
8383 20
8484 Over $5,000 but not over
8585 $6,000
8686 $125 plus 4% of excess over
8787 $5,000
8888
8989 21
9090 22
9191 Over $6,000 but not over
9292 $7,000
9393 $165 plus 4 1/2% of excess over
9494 $6,000
9595
9696 23
9797 24
9898 Over $7,000 but not over
9999 $8,000
100100 $210 plus 5% of excess over
101101 $7,000
102102
103103 25
104104 26
105105 Over $8,000 but not over
106106 $9,000
107107 $260 plus 5 1/2% of excess over
108108 $8,000
109109
110110 27
111111 28
112112 Over $9,000 $315 plus 6% of excess over
113113 $9,000
114114 SB 146 3
115115 percent. A reduction in the rate of tax shall take effect 47
116116 on January first of a calendar year and such reduced rates 48
117117 shall continue in effect until the next reduction occurs. 49
118118 (2) A reduction in the rate of tax shall only occur if 50
119119 the amount of net general revenue collected in the previous 51
120120 fiscal year exceeds the highest amount of net general 52
121121 revenue collected in any of the three fiscal years prior to 53
122122 such fiscal year by at least one hundred seventy-five 54
123123 million dollars. 55
124124 (3) Any modification of tax rates under this 56
125125 subsection shall only apply to tax years that begin on or 57
126126 after a modification takes effect. 58
127127 (4) The director of the department of revenue shall, 59
128128 by rule, adjust the tax tables under subsection 1 of this 60
129129 section to effectuate the provisions of this subsection. 61
130130 4. [(1) In addition to the rate reductions under 62
131131 subsections 2 and 3 of this section, beginning with the 63
132132 calendar year immediately following the calendar year in 64
133133 which a reduction is made pursuant to subsection 3 of this 65
134134 section, the top rate of tax under subsection 1 of this 66
135135 section may be further reduced over a period of years. Each 67
136136 reduction in the top rate of tax shall be by one-tenth of a 68
137137 percent and no more than one reduction shall occur in a 69
138138 calendar year. No more than three reductions shall be made 70
139139 under this subsection. Reductions in the rate of tax shall 71
140140 take effect on January first of a calendar year and such 72
141141 reduced rates shall continue in effect until the next 73
142142 reduction occurs. 74
143143 (2) (a) A reduction in the rate of tax shall only 75
144144 occur if: 76
145145 a. The amount of net general revenue collected in the 77
146146 previous fiscal year exceeds the highest amount of net 78 SB 146 4
147147 general revenue collected in any of the three fiscal years 79
148148 prior to such fiscal year by at least two hundred million 80
149149 dollars; and 81
150150 b. The amount of net general revenue collected in the 82
151151 previous fiscal year exceeds the amount of net general 83
152152 revenue collected in the fiscal year five years prior, 84
153153 adjusted annually by the percentage increase in inflation 85
154154 over the preceding five fiscal years. 86
155155 (b) The amount of net general revenue collected 87
156156 required by subparagraph a. of paragraph (a) of this 88
157157 subdivision in order to make a reduction pursuant to this 89
158158 subsection shall be adjusted annually by the percent 90
159159 increase in inflation beginning with January 2, 2023. 91
160160 (3) Any modification of tax rates under this 92
161161 subsection shall only apply to tax years that begin on or 93
162162 after a modification takes effect. 94
163163 (4) The director of the department of revenue shall, 95
164164 by rule, adjust the tax tables under subsection 1 of this 96
165165 section to effectuate the provisions of this subsection. 97
166166 The bracket for income subject to the top rate of tax shall 98
167167 be eliminated once the top rate of tax has been reduced 99
168168 below the rate applicable to such bracket, and the top 100
169169 remaining rate of tax shall apply to all income in excess of 101
170170 the income in the second highest remaining income bracket] 102
171171 For all tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2026, 103
172172 there shall be no tax imposed upon Missouri taxable income 104
173173 pursuant to this section. 105
174174 5. Beginning with the 2017 calendar year, the brackets 106
175175 of Missouri taxable income identified in subsection 1 of 107
176176 this section shall be adjusted annually by the percent 108
177177 increase in inflation. The director shall publish such 109
178178 brackets annually beginning on or after October 1, 2016. 110 SB 146 5
179179 Modifications to the brackets shall take effect on January 111
180180 first of each calendar year and shall apply to tax years 112
181181 beginning on or after the effective date of the new brackets. 113
182182 6. As used in this section, the following terms mean: 114
183183 (1) "CPI", the Consumer Price Index for All Urban 115
184184 Consumers for the United States as reported by the Bureau of 116
185185 Labor Statistics, or its successor index; 117
186186 (2) "CPI for the preceding calendar year", the average 118
187187 of the CPI as of the close of the twelve-month period ending 119
188188 on August thirty-first of such calendar year; 120
189189 (3) "Net general revenue collected", all revenue 121
190190 deposited into the general revenue fund, less refunds and 122
191191 revenues originally deposited into the general revenue fund 123
192192 but designated by law for a specific distribution or 124
193193 transfer to another state fund; 125
194194 (4) "Percent increase in inflation", the percentage, 126
195195 if any, by which the CPI for the preceding calendar year 127
196196 exceeds the CPI for the year beginning September 1, 2014, 128
197197 and ending August 31, 2015. 129
198198