House
|
04/24/2025
|
H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (In Fiscal Review)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Executive Session Scheduled H Rules - Legislative--(3:00 p.m. or Upon Adj. - HR 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Executive Session Scheduled H Financial Institutions--(12:00 p.m. or Upon morning recess - HR1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Hearing Scheduled H Financial Institutions--(12:00 p.m. or Upon morning recess - HR 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Referred H Financial Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Crawford)--(0678S.04F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (0678S.03C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2025
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2024
|
Prefiled
|
|
|