Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi House Bill HB1950 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-MISSISSIPPI LEGISLATURE 2025 Regular Session To: Judiciary B By: Representative Sanford House Bill 1950 (As Passed the House) AN ACT TO RESTORE THE RIGHT OF SUFFRAGE TO OMAR EUGENE MAGEE OF COVINGTON COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MISSISSIPPI: SECTION 1. The right of suffrage is hereby fully and completely restored to Omar Eugene Magee of Covington County, Mississippi, who was disqualified as an elector as a result of his conviction for the crime of grand larceny on May 25, 1978, in Covington County, Mississippi, for which he was sentenced to serve sixty (60) months in the custody of the Mississippi Department of Corrections, released on probation, violated probation and had probation revoked. On March 28, 1985, he was convicted of Burglary in Simpson County, Mississippi, for which he was sentenced to serve three (3) years, and released on June 20, 1986. He was convicted on March 19, 1999, for two (2) counts of the crime of delivery of a controlled substance to serve ten (10) years concurrently in the custody of the Mississippi Department of Corrections. He was discharged on September 12, 2008, due to expiration of sentence. He completed all terms and conditions of his sentence. The Legislature is informed that he has since conducted himself as a law-abiding and honorable citizen in a good and lawful manner. SECTION 2. This act shall take effect and be in force from and after its passage.
1+MISSISSIPPI LEGISLATURE 2025 Regular Session To: Judiciary B By: Representative Sanford House Bill 1950 AN ACT TO RESTORE THE RIGHT OF SUFFRAGE TO OMAR EUGENE MAGEE OF COVINGTON COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MISSISSIPPI: SECTION 1. The right of suffrage is hereby fully and completely restored to Omar Eugene Magee of Covington County, Mississippi, who was disqualified as an elector as a result of his conviction for the crime of grand larceny on May 25, 1978, in Covington County, Mississippi, for which he was sentenced to serve sixty (60) months in the custody of the Mississippi Department of Corrections, released on probation, violated probation and had probation revoked. On March 28, 1985, he was convicted of Burglary in Simpson County, Mississippi, for which he was sentenced to serve three (3) years, and released on June 20, 1986. He was convicted on March 19, 1999, for two (2) counts of the crime of delivery of a controlled substance to serve ten (10) years concurrently in the custody of the Mississippi Department of Corrections. He was discharged on September 12, 2008, due to expiration of sentence. He completed all terms and conditions of his sentence. The Legislature is informed that he has since conducted himself as a law-abiding and honorable citizen in a good and lawful manner. SECTION 2. This act shall take effect and be in force from and after its passage.
22
33 MISSISSIPPI LEGISLATURE
44
55 2025 Regular Session
66
77 To: Judiciary B
88
99 By: Representative Sanford
1010
1111 # House Bill 1950
12-
13-## (As Passed the House)
1412
1513 AN ACT TO RESTORE THE RIGHT OF SUFFRAGE TO OMAR EUGENE MAGEE OF COVINGTON COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI.
1614
1715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MISSISSIPPI:
1816
1917 SECTION 1. The right of suffrage is hereby fully and completely restored to Omar Eugene Magee of Covington County, Mississippi, who was disqualified as an elector as a result of his conviction for the crime of grand larceny on May 25, 1978, in Covington County, Mississippi, for which he was sentenced to serve sixty (60) months in the custody of the Mississippi Department of Corrections, released on probation, violated probation and had probation revoked. On March 28, 1985, he was convicted of Burglary in Simpson County, Mississippi, for which he was sentenced to serve three (3) years, and released on June 20, 1986. He was convicted on March 19, 1999, for two (2) counts of the crime of delivery of a controlled substance to serve ten (10) years concurrently in the custody of the Mississippi Department of Corrections.
2018
2119 He was discharged on September 12, 2008, due to expiration of sentence. He completed all terms and conditions of his sentence. The Legislature is informed that he has since conducted himself as a law-abiding and honorable citizen in a good and lawful manner.
2220
2321 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect and be in force from and after its passage.