Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi House Bill HB1967 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 03/21/2025

                            MISSISSIPPI LEGISLATURE 2025 Regular Session To: Judiciary B By: Representative Karriem House Bill 1967 (As Passed the House) AN ACT TO RESTORE THE RIGHT OF SUFFRAGE TO TRACEY RICE OF LOWNDES COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI.      BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MISSISSIPPI:      SECTION 1.  The right of suffrage is hereby fully and completely restored to Tracey Rice of Lowndes County, Mississippi, who was disqualified as an elector as a result of her conviction for the crime of shoplifting in Lowndes County, on May 21, 2014, for which she was sentenced to serve five (5) years probation under the supervision of the Mississippi Department of Corrections.  Upon release to probation, she violated probation and it was revoked.  On September 2, 2016, she was charged for possession of a controlled substance and sentenced to serve one (1) year house arrest under the supervision of the Mississippi Department of Corrections.       She was released to probation on April 27, 2017, and discharged on July 14, 2017.  The Legislature is informed that she has since conducted herself as a law-abiding and honorable citizen in a good and lawful manner.      SECTION 2.  This act shall take effect and be in force from and after its passage. 

MISSISSIPPI LEGISLATURE

2025 Regular Session

To: Judiciary B

By: Representative Karriem

# House Bill 1967

## (As Passed the House)

AN ACT TO RESTORE THE RIGHT OF SUFFRAGE TO TRACEY RICE OF LOWNDES COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI.

     BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MISSISSIPPI:

     SECTION 1.  The right of suffrage is hereby fully and completely restored to Tracey Rice of Lowndes County, Mississippi, who was disqualified as an elector as a result of her conviction for the crime of shoplifting in Lowndes County, on May 21, 2014, for which she was sentenced to serve five (5) years probation under the supervision of the Mississippi Department of Corrections.  Upon release to probation, she violated probation and it was revoked.  On September 2, 2016, she was charged for possession of a controlled substance and sentenced to serve one (1) year house arrest under the supervision of the Mississippi Department of Corrections. 

     She was released to probation on April 27, 2017, and discharged on July 14, 2017.  The Legislature is informed that she has since conducted herself as a law-abiding and honorable citizen in a good and lawful manner.

     SECTION 2.  This act shall take effect and be in force from and after its passage.