Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi House Bill HB1990 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 MISSISSIPPI LEGISLATURE 2025 Regular Session To: Judiciary B By: Representative Porter House Bill 1990 AN ACT TO RESTORE THE RIGHT OF SUFFRAGE TO DERRICK DUJMOV OF HARRISON COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MISSISSIPPI: SECTION 1. The right of suffrage is hereby fully and completely restored to Derrick Dujmov of Harrison County, Mississippi, who was disqualified as an elector as a result of his conviction for the crime of grand larceny and possession of a controlled substance in Harrison County, on September 8, 2011, for which he was sentenced to two (2) years post supervised probation and three (3) years in the custody of the Mississippi Department of Corrections. He was released to parole on August 27, 2013, and discharged from probation on August 14, 2024. On October 1, 2018, he was sentenced to serve two (2) years and six (6) months to run consecutively for the crime of delivery of a controlled substance. He was released to parole on June 10, 2019. He was discharged from probation on February 5, 2022. The Legislature is informed that he has since conducted himself as a law-abiding and honorable citizen in a good and lawful manner. SECTION 2. This act shall take effect and be in force from and after its passage.
22
33 MISSISSIPPI LEGISLATURE
44
55 2025 Regular Session
66
77 To: Judiciary B
88
99 By: Representative Porter
1010
1111 # House Bill 1990
1212
1313 AN ACT TO RESTORE THE RIGHT OF SUFFRAGE TO DERRICK DUJMOV OF HARRISON COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI.
1414
1515 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MISSISSIPPI:
1616
1717 SECTION 1. The right of suffrage is hereby fully and completely restored to Derrick Dujmov of Harrison County, Mississippi, who was disqualified as an elector as a result of his conviction for the crime of grand larceny and possession of a controlled substance in Harrison County, on September 8, 2011, for which he was sentenced to two (2) years post supervised probation and three (3) years in the custody of the Mississippi Department of Corrections. He was released to parole on August 27, 2013, and discharged from probation on August 14, 2024.
1818
1919 On October 1, 2018, he was sentenced to serve two (2) years and six (6) months to run consecutively for the crime of delivery of a controlled substance.
2020
2121 He was released to parole on June 10, 2019. He was discharged from probation on February 5, 2022. The Legislature is informed that he has since conducted himself as a law-abiding and honorable citizen in a good and lawful manner.
2222
2323 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect and be in force from and after its passage.