Senate | 03/04/2025 | Died In Committee | ||
Senate | 02/17/2025 | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Transmitted To Senate | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Haney, Anderson (122nd), Hulum) | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Title Suff Do Pass | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Referred To Marine Resources |