Senate | 03/04/2025 | Died In Committee | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Transmitted To Senate | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Tullos, Creekmore IV, Felsher) | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Passed As Amended | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Amended | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Title Suff Do Pass | ||
House | 01/17/2025 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |