04/07/2025 | Due From Governor 04/24/25 | |||
House | 04/07/2025 | Enrolled Bill Signed | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Returned For Enrolling | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Barnett, Hines) | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Title Suff Do Pass | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Transmitted To House | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Immediate Release | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | DR - TSDP: LP To FI | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |