Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3287 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 MISSISSIPPI LEGISLATURE 2025 Regular Session To: Judiciary, Division B By: Senator(s) Carter Senate Bill 3287 AN ACT TO RESTORE THE RIGHT OF SUFFRAGE TO CORDERRO MARTIN OF HARRISON COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI; AND FOR RELATED PURPOSES. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MISSISSIPPI: SECTION 1. The right of suffrage is hereby fully and completely restored to Corderro Martin of Harrison County, Mississippi, who was disqualified as an elector as a result of his conviction for the crime of felony shoplifting on June 19, 2014, in Harrison County, Mississippi. He was sentenced to serve a term of ten (10) years in the custody of the Department of Corrections, including attendance and successful completion of the "'Long Term' Drug and Alcohol Rehabilitation Program." On June 30, 2016, Martin was convicted of conspiracy to introduce a controlled substance in Greene County, Mississippi. He was sentenced to serve five (5) years with three (3) years and three hundred sixty-four (364) days suspended in the custody of the Mississippi Department of Corrections. On August 31, 2016, he was paroled. On September 8, 2020, he was discharged from the custody of the Mississippi Department of Corrections. He has completed all terms and conditions of his sentence. The Legislature is informed that he has since conducted himself as a law-abiding and honorable citizen in a good and lawful manner. SECTION 2. This act shall take effect and be in force from and after July 1, 2025.
22
33 MISSISSIPPI LEGISLATURE
44
55 2025 Regular Session
66
77 To: Judiciary, Division B
88
99 By: Senator(s) Carter
1010
1111 # Senate Bill 3287
1212
1313 AN ACT TO RESTORE THE RIGHT OF SUFFRAGE TO CORDERRO MARTIN OF HARRISON COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI; AND FOR RELATED PURPOSES.
1414
1515 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MISSISSIPPI:
1616
1717 SECTION 1. The right of suffrage is hereby fully and completely restored to Corderro Martin of Harrison County, Mississippi, who was disqualified as an elector as a result of his conviction for the crime of felony shoplifting on June 19, 2014, in Harrison County, Mississippi. He was sentenced to serve a term of ten (10) years in the custody of the Department of Corrections, including attendance and successful completion of the "'Long Term' Drug and Alcohol Rehabilitation Program." On June 30, 2016, Martin was convicted of conspiracy to introduce a controlled substance in Greene County, Mississippi. He was sentenced to serve five (5) years with three (3) years and three hundred sixty-four (364) days suspended in the custody of the Mississippi Department of Corrections.
1818
1919 On August 31, 2016, he was paroled. On September 8, 2020, he was discharged from the custody of the Mississippi Department of Corrections. He has completed all terms and conditions of his sentence. The Legislature is informed that he has since conducted himself as a law-abiding and honorable citizen in a good and lawful manner.
2020
2121 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect and be in force from and after July 1, 2025.