House | 03/12/2025 | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal | ||
House | 01/16/2025 | (H) Bill Withdrawn per House Rule H30-50(3)(b) | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) State Administration | ||
House | 01/10/2025 | (H) First Reading | ||
House | 01/10/2025 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration | ||
House | 01/10/2025 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested | ||
House | 01/10/2025 | (H) Introduced | ||
House | 01/08/2025 | (LC) Draft Delivered to Requester | ||
House | 01/06/2025 | (LC) Draft Ready for Delivery | ||
House | 01/02/2025 | (LC) Draft in Assembly | ||
House | 01/01/2025 | (LC) Draft in Final Drafter Review | ||
House | 12/31/2024 | (LC) Draft in Input/Proofing | ||
House | 12/27/2024 | (LC) Draft in Edit | ||
House | 11/27/2024 | (LC) Drafter Assigned |