House | 04/07/2025 | (H) Missed Deadline for Referendum Proposal Transmittal | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | ||
House | 02/21/2025 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary | ||
House | 02/21/2025 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | (H) Fiscal Note Signed | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | (H) Fiscal Note Received | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | (H) First Reading | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | (H) Introduced | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | (LC) Draft Delivered to Requester | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | (LC) Draft Ready for Delivery | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | (LC) Draft in Assembly | ||
House | 02/02/2025 | (LC) Draft in Final Drafter Review | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | (LC) Draft in Input/Proofing | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | (LC) Draft in Edit | ||
House | 01/25/2025 | (LC) Draft in Legal Review | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | (LC) Drafter Assigned |