Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
(S) 3rd Reading Failed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
(S) 2nd Reading Concurred
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor and Economic Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor and Economic Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
(S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor and Economic Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
(S) First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
(S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor and Economic Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
(H) Transmitted to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
(H) 3rd Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
(H) 2nd Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
(H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
(H) First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
(H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
(H) Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
(LC) Draft Delivered to Requester
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
(LC) Draft Ready for Delivery
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
(LC) Draft in Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
(LC) Draft in Final Drafter Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
(LC) Draft in Input/Proofing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
(LC) Draft in Edit
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
(LC) Draft in Legal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
(LC) Draft Taken Off Hold
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
(LC) Draft On Hold
|
|
|
House
|
12/15/2024
|
(LC) Drafter Assigned
|
|
|