House | 04/28/2025 | (H) Returned from Enrolling | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | (H) Resolution Adopted | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | (H) Sent to Enrolling | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | (H) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted as Amended (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | (H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | (H) First Reading | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | (H) Introduced | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | (LC) Draft Delivered to Requester | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | (LC) Draft Ready for Delivery | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | (LC) Draft in Assembly | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | (LC) Draft in Final Drafter Review | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | (LC) Draft in Input/Proofing | ||
House | 02/08/2025 | (LC) Draft in Edit | ||
House | 02/07/2025 | (LC) Draft in Legal Review | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | (LC) Draft Taken Off Hold | ||
House | 12/14/2024 | (LC) Draft On Hold | ||
House | 12/14/2024 | (LC) Drafter Assigned |