House
|
04/22/2025
|
(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) State Administration
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
(H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) State Administration
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Not Concurred as Amended (H) State Administration
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
(H) Hearing (H) State Administration
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
(H) First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
(H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2025
|
(S) Transmitted to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2025
|
(S) 3rd Reading Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2025
|
(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
(S) 2nd Reading Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
(S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
(S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
(S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
(S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
(S) Fiscal Note Unsigned
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
(S) Fiscal Note Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
(S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
(S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
(S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
(S) Fiscal Note Printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) State Administration
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) State Administration
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2025
|
(S) Hearing (S) State Administration
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
(S) Fiscal Note Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
(S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
(S) First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
(S) Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
(LC) Draft Delivered to Requester
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2025
|
(LC) Draft Ready for Delivery
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
(LC) Draft in Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
(LC) Draft in Final Drafter Review
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
(LC) Draft in Input/Proofing
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
(LC) Draft in Edit
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
(LC) Draft in Legal Review
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
(LC) Drafter Assigned
|
|
|